RICHARD YESHWANT RAO HOLKAR
-
About RICHARD YESHWANT RAO HOLKAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51398MH1982PTC027045 RICHARD HOLKAR JEWELLERS PVT LTD 100000.0 Active 01/08/1994 - U55101DL2004PTC131567 AHILYA HOSPITALITY AND TRAVEL PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 23/12/2004 - U63040DL2005PTC134577 TIGER TOP CULTURAL AND ADVENTURE TOURS PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 31/03/2005 - U74999DL2004PTC131596 HOLKAR DESIGNS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/12/2004 - U95000MP1987PTC004279 REHWA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT PVT LTD 100020.0 Active 04/09/1995 - -
Associated with Directors
YESHWANT RANDALL HOLKAR Director