RAVINDER TALWAR
-
About RAVINDER TALWAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15500CH2011PTC032998 BIHAR DISTILLERS & BOTTLERS PRIVATE LIMITED 4745880.0 Active 30/05/2011 - U24119DL1987PLC019340 DIGVIJAY CHEMICALS LIMITED 63888000.0 Active 10/07/2009 - U40100HP2004PTC026975 KAPIL MOHAN AND ASSOCIATES HYDRO POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 98850000.0 Active 19/11/2009 - U40101CH2007PTC031012 KUT NON CONVENTIONAL ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 4150000.0 Active 26/03/2014 - U40101CH2011PTC032861 HIMANI HYDRO POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 192500.0 Active 26/03/2014 - U40101HP2007PTC030782 KURMI ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 160439000.0 Active 11/10/2012 - U40101PB1999PTC022843 AQUA POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 100240000.0 Active 10/02/2010 - U51101DL2006PTC148610 CAPRI INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 4759500.0 Active 18/05/2011 - -
Associated with Directors