RAJENDRA MULCHAND VARMA
-
About RAJENDRA MULCHAND VARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U24246MH1989PTC050462 CONSOLIDATED REMEDIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 13/03/2009 - U45200MH2011PTC219259 ZONE INFRACON PRIVATE LIMITED 590000.0 Active 10/08/2011 - U45202MH2009PTC193004 KARGWAL DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 04/06/2009 - U45202MH2011PTC217055 TRANSWORLD INFRAPROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 5100000.0 Active 04/05/2011 - U45203MH2007PTC174626 KARGWAL CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 10800000.0 Active 01/10/2007 - U70100MH2005PTC157754 OMKAR REALTORS & DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 96590600.0 Active 02/12/2005 - U70102MH2009PTC197762 OMKAR REALTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 295100000.0 Active 10/12/2009 - U74899MH1948PTC231641 JALLO SUBSIDIARY INDUSTRIES CO INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Dissolved 06/01/2012 - U74900MH2011PTC221756 ANYTIME HARBOUR OF YACHTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/09/2011 - U74999MH2008PTC183663 OMKAR NATURAL RESOURCES PRIVATE LIMITED 70000000.0 Active 18/06/2008 - U74999MH2008PTC187876 RIDHI SIDHI SHETKARI PRIVATE LIMITED 8600000.0 Active 31/10/2008 - U85310MH2014NPL256635 OMKAR FOUNDATION 100000.0 Active 19/11/2014 - -
Associated with Directors