RAJ KUMAR MANDAL
-
About RAJ KUMAR MANDAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U13100WB2008PTC129094 SHYAM MINMET PRIVATE LIMITED 1590000.0 Active 27/06/2014 - U45400WB2014PTC201476 SARVADA HIRISE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/11/2014 - U45400WB2014PTC201507 SANKATHARAN REALESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/11/2014 - U45400WB2014PTC201513 SHITALMAY HEIGHTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/11/2014 - U51909WB2014PTC201519 MADHUDHAN MERCANTILE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/11/2014 - U51909WB2014PTC201520 MEANTIME VINIMAY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/11/2014 - U51909WB2014PTC201531 DINANATH SALES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/11/2014 - U51909WB2014PTC201534 KALASHSIDHI COMMERCE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/11/2014 - U51909WB2014PTC201535 MOONLIKE VYAPAAR PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/11/2014 - U51909WB2014PTC201537 MOONTREE ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/11/2014 - U70100WB2008PTC126431 SINGHBHUM STEEL & POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 1170000.0 Active 04/12/2014 - U74999WB2011PTC169367 GOODLIFE HYDRO POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/12/2014 - -
Associated with Directors
RANJAN BHATTACHARYA Director SATYANARAYAN KUNDU Director CHANDA CHOUDHARY Director RAHUL GADODIA Director