RAJEEV JUGALKISHOR MUNDRA
-
About RAJEEV JUGALKISHOR MUNDRA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L27100DN1960PLC000371 PERMANENT MAGNETS LIMITED 85984530.0 Active 16/04/2007 - L99999MH1965PLC013392 TAPARIA TOOLS LIMITED 30357500.0 Active 30/01/2010 - U25209MH1993PLC073582 PREGNA INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 4251750.0 Active 03/11/2004 - U50404MH2007PTC168762 LIFETIME MOBBILITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 2500000.0 Active 17/04/2017 - U74900MH2016PTC273402 SKVM GLOBAL SERVICE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/02/2016 - U74999MH2015PTC263021 VISTAAR LOGISTIC PRIVATE LIMITED 2250000.0 Active 25/02/2016 - -
Associated with Directors