RAVI KRISHNA
-
About RAVI KRISHNA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U74140MH2011PTC212757 ZIQITZA BRAND MANAGEMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/01/2011 - U80301MH2007PTC171869 ZIQITZA EDUCATIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 21/06/2007 - U85110MH2007PTC168793 ZIQITZA NURSING SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 11/03/2010 - U92412MH2010PTC209348 ZIQITZA EAGLES FOOTBALL CLUB PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 22/10/2010 - -
Associated with Directors
SWETA MANGAL Director NARAYANA KURUP ASOKAN Director SUNITHA MARKOSE Director