RAJSHREE TAPURIAH
-
About RAJSHREE TAPURIAH,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L17110MH1985PLC035204 KAJAL SYNTHETICS AND SILK MILLS LIMITED 19920000.0 Active 30/03/2015 - L27300MH1983PLC029360 NILKANTH ENGINEERING LIMITED 12450000.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U30007MH2005PTC152392 VERITE SOFTWARE PRIVATE LIMITED 269500.0 Active 19/04/2007 - U65993MH1982PLC028250 ASHISH TRADING AND AGENCY LIMITED 1760500.0 Amalgamated 02/09/1993 - U67120MH1982PTC028252 RAJRATNA HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 512000.0 Active 04/09/1993 - U67120MH1983PLC031150 AVILOK TRADE & FINANCE LIMITED 2190200.0 Amalgamated 14/02/2011 - U67120MH1983PLC031160 ANUKOOL TRADE & FINANCE LIMITED 2190200.0 Amalgamated 14/02/2011 - U74900MH1984PTC032159 ADITYA BIRLA AHURA CENTRE MANAGEMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 340000.0 Active 30/08/1993 - U74900WB1973PTC028751 RAJSHREE TRADE & DEVELOPMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 160000.0 Active 02/04/1973 - -
Associated with Directors