RITA MANSINGKA
-
About RITA MANSINGKA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U18201DL1981PTC117449 ARVIND SILK MILLS PRIVATE LIMITED 250000.0 Converted to LLP 02/04/2012 - U51101DL2009PTC196536 GEEPEE SOFTECH SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 24750000.0 Active 02/12/2009 - U74140DL2011PTC216305 INSUREXCELLENCE ADVISORS PRIVATE LIMITED 43580420.0 Active 19/09/2011 - U74899DL1994PTC090652 ILLINGWORTH MARKETING PRIVATE LIMITED 2450200.0 Converted to LLP 11/02/1997 - -
Associated with Directors
MANEESH MANSINGKA Director SHWETA MANSINGKA Director