RAMPRASAD LANKA
-
About RAMPRASAD LANKA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U20213MH2003PTC143064 NAGPUR CHIP BOARDS PRIVATE LIMITED 12500000.0 Active 27/09/2011 - U20213MH2004PTC149676 MODERN AGROBOARDS PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 24/11/2004 - U20296MH2007PTC175192 KARNATAKA CHIPBOARDS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/10/2007 - U27109MH2007PTC167042 SATPRATAP ENGINEERING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/01/2011 - U74999MH1995PLC056809 AUROBINDO LAMINATIONS LIMITED 20455500.0 Active 01/04/2008 - -
Associated with Directors
PRAKASHRAO PRASADARAO LANKA Director SANDEEP INDERJEET SURI Director RIPUDAMAN JOGINDAR UBEROI Director