RAMESH DATTATRAY SAWANT
-
About RAMESH DATTATRAY SAWANT,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15500MH1984PTC034309 VULCAN DISTILLERIES PVT LTD 500000.0 Active 19/08/1994 - U15500MH1990PTC058887 ALFA DISTILLERIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/08/1996 - U21099MH2004PTC147851 SUPER COATS CARBONLESS PAPER MILLS PRIVATE LIMITED 5001000.0 Active 05/08/2004 - U45200MH2008PTC179662 SAPPHIRE SPACE INFRACON PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 17/02/2009 - U45203KA2007PTC051196 CONGLOME TECHNOCONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 39423240.0 Active 03/03/2015 - U45400MH2008PTC179962 VIANCA LAND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED. 100000.0 Active 11/03/2008 - U74120MH2014PTC258929 BHUMIKA CLEANTECH SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 17/05/2017 - U74900MH2014PTC258439 RAM CLEANSERS & DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 17/05/2017 - -
Associated with Directors