RAKESH KUMAR AGARWAL
-
About RAKESH KUMAR AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15131UP1995PTC017490 SRINATE AGRI VENTURES AND REAL ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 953000.0 Active 10/01/2009 - U45201UP1998PTC023496 VAIBHAV BUILD TECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 26/05/1998 - U45201UP2016PTC086776 SARYU INFRACITY PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 11/11/2017 - U45309UP2016PTC085652 ANUBHAV INFRACARE PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 16/08/2016 - U45500UP2016PTC085666 ANUBHAV INFRAZONE PRIVATE LIMITED 600000.0 Active 16/08/2016 - U45500UP2016PTC085679 ANUBHAV GREENLAND PRIVATE LIMITED 600000.0 Active 17/08/2016 - U70109UP2017PTC090946 MODERNCITY REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 02/03/2017 -