RAKESH KUMAR JAIN
-
About RAKESH KUMAR JAIN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U14101RJ1997PTC013263 SWOT MARBLE AND MINERALS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/10/2010 - U45201RJ2006PTC023337 PARAMOUNT BUILDESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/08/2008 - U45201RJ2009PTC028150 SIDDHI VINAYAK PROPCON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 22/01/2009 - U45201RJ2009PTC029357 ROUNAK TOWNSHIP PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/01/2010 - U45201RJ2012PTC037610 NEMINATH BUILDHOME PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/01/2012 - U51505RJ2009PTC029265 DAULAT ELECTROTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/07/2009 -