RISHI PAL SAHARAN
-
About RISHI PAL SAHARAN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U10100CT2009PTC021077 ARYAVRAT COAL BENEFICIATIONS & POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 7600000.0 Active 26/02/2009 - U10200CT2009PTC021080 QUALITY WASHERY & ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/08/2011 - U13209CT2004PTC017162 SWASTIK POWER & MINERAL RESOURCES PRIVATE LIMITED 1645907500.0 Active 07/09/2011 - U51909WB2004PTC098741 REWARD VINIMAY PRIVATE LIMITED 2244000.0 Amalgamated 01/06/2006 - U55109WB1994PTC064530 TANDEM COMMERCIAL PVT.LTD. 37600000.0 Active 13/09/2011 - U70200CT2013PTC000844 ANTRATMA REAL ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 22600000.0 Active 01/08/2014 - U70200DL2013PTC255415 GREENWOOD BUILDTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/03/2015 - U74120CT2013PTC000820 SINGH SKILL RECRUITMENT AGENCY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 13/02/2016 - U80904HR2017PTC068354 INSSPIRE INDIA EDUCARE PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 29/03/2017 - -
Associated with Directors