RAM PRASAD
-
About RAM PRASAD,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01122DL1995PLC067626 KUBER PLANTERS LTD. 500000.0 Active 02/09/2008 - U29220DL1994PLC062595 KUBER INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 607000.0 Active 01/09/2008 - U45400DL1995PLC069973 KUBER BUILDWELL LIMITED 500000.0 Active 29/08/2008 - U55100DL1990PLC040411 KUBER RESORTS LIMITED 9895000.0 Active 20/08/2008 - U67120DL1985PLC020063 KUBER FINANCE (INDIA) LIMITED 43856000.0 Active 21/08/2008 - U74899DL1993PLC054361 KUBER FERRO ALLOYS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 30/08/2008 - -
Associated with Directors
ROWENA SHARMA Director CHANDRA PAL SINGH Director