RAKESH CHAND SHARMA
-
About RAKESH CHAND SHARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U30007DL1991PLC210015 VIRGO SOFTECH LIMITED 314003560.0 Active 25/08/2015 - U30007DL2002PTC113714 FIRSTBIZ NETWORK PRIVATE LIMITED 8333310.0 Active 22/08/2013 - U32204DL2007PTC165265 SATURN INFOSERVE PRIVATE LIMITED 19550000.0 Active 10/06/2013 - U70102DL2014PTC274203 KALYPSO DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/12/2014 - U70109DL2014PTC274200 COREBRIX DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/12/2014 - U70200DL2014PTC274194 TROPICANA HOMES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/12/2014 - U72200DL2000PLC108354 RADSUN TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED 31598550.0 Active 01/09/2010 - U72900DL2003PLC119179 SATURN INFOCOM LIMITED 19950000.0 Active 09/11/2010 - U74899DL1995PLC070980 PATLIPUTRA INTERNATIONAL LTD 3187120.0 Active 01/11/2010 - -
Associated with Directors