RAKESH KUMAR TIWARI
-
About RAKESH KUMAR TIWARI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27310WB2012PTC173138 ALLMOST STEELS PRIVATE LIMITED 5440000.0 Active 30/01/2012 - U45400WB2011PTC170954 SHIVMANGAL INFRABUILD PRIVATE LIMITED 16850000.0 Active 14/03/2012 - U51909WB2011PTC171500 PAWANPUTRA EXIM PRIVATE LIMITED 12450000.0 Active 14/03/2012 - U51909WB2011PTC171513 SUBHSHREE IMPEX PRIVATE LIMITED 16850000.0 Active 14/03/2012 - U51909WB2012PTC173613 CONSCIOUS TRADERS PRIVATE LIMITED 5750000.0 Active 15/03/2012 - U51909WB2012PTC175216 OUTCOME PLYWOOD PRIVATE LIMITED 5750000.0 Active 16/03/2012 - U51909WB2012PTC175225 RANCHHOR PLYWOOD PRIVATE LIMITED 5750000.0 Active 16/03/2012 - U74140WB2010PTC156431 LEMONGRASS INVESTMENT CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 5166500.0 Active 30/12/2010 - U74999WB2012PTC173200 EVERSTRONG UDYOG PRIVATE LIMITED 5440000.0 Active 31/01/2012 - U74999WB2012PTC173201 FASTSPEED GLOBAL PRIVATE LIMITED 7430000.0 Active 31/01/2012 - U74999WB2012PTC173202 ROYALPET INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED 9420000.0 Active 31/01/2012 - -
Associated with Directors
PALASH BAIDYA Director RANJAN KUMAR JHA Director SUDHANSHU AGARWALA Director SHAKTIPADA PRAMANIK Director