RAJESH KALICHARAN SHUKLA
-
About RAJESH KALICHARAN SHUKLA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15400DL2008PTC182696 MONTAGE PROMOTERS PRIVATE LIMITED 21361430.0 Active 26/07/2010 - U24100MH2011PTC222253 MONTAGE HEALTH CARE & BIOCHEM PRIVATE LIMITED 7600000.0 Active 21/09/2011 - U27100MH2011PTC215812 SHREM STEEL & ENGINEERING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/04/2016 - U45400MH2011PTC221174 RKNTM MONTAGE REALTY & INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/08/2011 - U67120MH1995PLC086755 MONTAGE CAPITAL MARKETS LIMITED 4000000.0 Active 23/12/2003 - U72300MH2013PTC244643 MONTAGE INNOVATIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/06/2013 - U74140DL2010PTC205106 TWENTY TWENTY CLEANTECH CAPITAL AND ADVISORY PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 02/07/2010 - U85100MH2015PTC262538 MONTAGE HEALTHCARE CLINIC PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/03/2015 - U92410DL2017NPL314449 CHALO OLYMPIC FOUNDATION 100000.0 Active 14/03/2017 - U92412MH2010PTC207892 AAVISKAAAR MOVIETONE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/10/2010 - U92412MH2012PTC229699 OFF SPIN SPORTS & ACTIVITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/04/2012 - U92490MH2010PTC202979 SURABHI LIVING HERITAGE PRIVATE LIMITED 101400000.0 Active 15/10/2012 - -
Associated with Directors