RITA VIKAS SARUP
-
About RITA VIKAS SARUP,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45200MH2005PTC154769 FLORA FACILITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/03/2014 - U45201PN2002PTC019651 CHERRY CONSTRUCTION PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/06/2014 - U45202PN2007PTC129496 SPACE CENTRIC MARKETING AND CONSTRUCTION CONSULTANCY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 25/06/2014 - U70100MH1995PTC093794 NAGOAN RESORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/09/2014 - U70102PN2008PLC131230 VASCON INFRASTRUCTURE LIMITED 3000000.0 Active 31/03/2014 -