RAMESH JUYAL
-
About RAMESH JUYAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U70100HR2011PTC042310 KIRPALU BUILDWELL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/03/2011 - U70100HR2011PTC042314 HANSVAHINI BUILDMART PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/03/2011 - U70100HR2011PTC042316 DURGA MATA BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/03/2011 - U70100HR2011PTC042325 GYANESHWARI BUILDMART PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/03/2011 - U70101HR2011PTC042303 PARMESH BUILDWELL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/03/2011 - U70101HR2011PTC042342 SHRIPATI LAND DEVELOPMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/03/2011 - U70101HR2011PTC042354 TRILOKESH LAND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/03/2011 - U70104HR2011PTC042313 ANJANI SUNU BUILDMART PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/03/2011 - U70109PB2011PTC034709 KANHAIYA LAND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 21/02/2011 - U70109PB2011PTC034726 LORD VISHNU BUILDPRO PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 22/02/2011 - U70109PB2011PTC034728 TRIMURTI LANDPRO PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 22/02/2011 - U70109PB2011PTC034735 MAA LAXMI LANDPRO PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/02/2011 - U70109PB2011PTC034738 SARASWATI LANDPRO PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/02/2011 - U70200HR2011PTC042346 VARADRAJ LANDPRO PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/03/2011 - U70200HR2011PTC042355 UMESHWAR BUILDMART PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/03/2011 - -
Associated with Directors
ISHWAR SINGH Director VIKRAM VERMA Director BHARAT SINGH Director ANIL KUMAR Director