RAKESH RAMAN KUKKAR
-
About RAKESH RAMAN KUKKAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01100RJ2017PTC057344 DESERT SPLENDOUR JOJOBA OIL PLANTATION PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/03/2017 - U01122RJ2011PTC035083 THAR NURSERIES PRIVATE LIMITED 1500000.0 Active 05/05/2011 - U01122RJ2011PTC037417 ABU JOJOBA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 22/12/2011 - U01122RJ2012PTC037635 PACE AGROFARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/10/2012 - U01122RJ2012PTC037658 ABU JOJOBA FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/01/2012 - U01122RJ2012PTC037895 MANDARIN AGROFARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/10/2012 - U01122RJ2012PTC037897 MAGENTA AGROFARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/10/2012 - U01122RJ2012PTC038271 THAR JOJOBA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/03/2012 - U01122RJ2012PTC038295 BIKANER JOJOBA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 21/03/2012 - U01122RJ2012PTC039246 MANDARIN HITECH AGROFARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/10/2012 - U01122RJ2012PTC039291 MANDARIN AGROTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/10/2012 - U01122RJ2012PTC039295 MANDARIN JOJOBA FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/10/2012 - U01122RJ2012PTC039558 MANDARIN JOJOBA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/10/2012 - U01122RJ2014PTC045927 THAR JOJOBA FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 17/07/2014 - U01122RJ2014PTC045934 BIKANER JOJOBA FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 18/07/2014 -