RAJESH SOIRU DEMPO
-
About RAJESH SOIRU DEMPO,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L15139GA1984PLC000601 HINDUSTAN FOODS LIMITED 145925000.0 Active 09/11/2015 - L23109GA1967PLC000076 GOA CARBON LIMITED 91510520.0 Active 08/01/2016 - U13100GA1998PTC002550 V.S.DEMPO MINING CORPORATION PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/11/2015 - U55100GA2017PTC013175 DEMPO VISION RESORTS AND CONSTRUCTION PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/03/2017 - U55101GA2012PTC006932 VISION DEMPO HOSPITALITY AND ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 13000000.0 Active 24/04/2012 - U74300GA2012PTC006999 VISHWAS MEDIA AND ENTERTAINMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/07/2012 - U80210GA2017PTC013156 VISHWASRAO DEMPO ACADEMY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/03/2017 - -
Associated with Directors