RADHA
-
About RADHA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01400TN2012PTC085184 BHADRAK PLANTATIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/03/2012 - U01400TN2012PTC085185 PARAMJEET PLANTATIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/03/2012 - U01500TN2012PTC084333 AJITABH ORCHARDES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/02/2012 - U40102TG2013PTC089121 TATVA RENEWABLE POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/07/2013 - U40102TG2013PTC091485 GREENFEET ECOENERGIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 04/12/2013 - U40300TG2013PTC090798 BELLEWOOD ECOENERGIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 04/11/2013 - U45209TG2013PTC088592 KURRAL INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 25/06/2013 - -
Associated with Directors
PAVITRA Director LOKESWARA Director NEERAJA Director ANJANA Director JYOTHI Director