RAHUL KUMAR AGARWAL
-
About RAHUL KUMAR AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51909WB2014PLC200853 ASTDURGA BUSINESS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 11/03/2014 - U51909WB2014PLC200909 SHIVAASHA RETAILERS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 12/03/2014 - U51909WB2014PLC200996 BHOOTNATH VANIJYA LIMITED 500000.0 Active 13/03/2014 - U51909WB2014PLC201007 HARGOURI VYAPAAR LIMITED 500000.0 Active 13/03/2014 - U60231WB2012PTC173868 ARROWLINK LOGISTICS PRIVATE LIMITED 111250.0 Active 18/08/2015 - U67190WB2010PTC154975 REALIZATION STOCK & EQUITY PRIVATE LIMITED 2350000.0 Active 25/03/2016 - U74999WB2011PTC171427 SHREE NARSINGH CREATION TRADERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/11/2013 - U74999WB2011PTC171428 WOODSTICK MERCHANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 2286300.0 Active 29/11/2013 - U74999WB2012PTC173883 CAPABLE FASHION PRIVATE LIMITED 583400.0 Active 18/08/2015 - U74999WB2012PTC174343 MANIKALA SUPPLIERS PRIVATE LIMITED 111250.0 Active 03/02/2016 - -
Associated with Directors
AYAN SEN Director PARAS KUMAR Director ANUP SHAH Director SUNITA KUMARI SHAH Director RAJU RAM Director