RAJASEKHARA RAGHAVA KURUP
-
About RAJASEKHARA RAGHAVA KURUP,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45201MH2015PTC261517 TRIBUS REAL ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/05/2017 - U51900MH1977PLC110245 BIRLA INFRASTRUCTURE LIMITED 2503000.0 Active 05/11/2015 - U74999MH2016PTC280753 ZENITH BIRLA STEELS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/05/2016 - U74999MH2016PTC284861 ROLMER ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 08/03/2017 - U80904MH2016PLC271637 BIRLA SHLOKA KNOWLEDGE SCHOOL LIMITED 100000.0 Active 04/01/2016 - -
Associated with Directors