SHYAMSUNDER GOPILALJI AGRAWAL
-
About SHYAMSUNDER GOPILALJI AGRAWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01120MH1999PLC122855 MAHYCO VEGETABLE SEEDS LIMITED 29305000.0 Amalgamated 01/12/1999 - U01135JK1973PLC000388 SUNGRO SEEDS RESEARCH LIMITED 9450000.0 Amalgamated 29/07/1996 - U01400MH2016PTC274286 BR SEEDS AND TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 13/03/2016 - U01403MH1990PTC055515 VIKRAM SEEDS PRIVATE LIMITED 198800.0 Amalgamated 28/04/2008 - U01403MH2016PTC274258 AR SEEDS AND TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 143100000.0 Amalgamated 12/03/2016 - U40107MH1995PLC084203 MAHYCO SEEDS LIMITED 146528000.0 Amalgamated 07/03/2003 - U67120MH2006PTC159783 BARWALE INVESTMENT AND TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 50000000.0 Amalgamated 16/02/2006 - U73100MH1997PTC111505 MAHYCO MONSANTO BIOTECH (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 218700000.0 Active 23/10/1997 - U74899DL1991PLC044605 SUNGRO SEED EXPORTS LIMITED 4812500.0 Amalgamated 29/07/1996 - -
Associated with Directors