SUSHAMA RAJENDRA BARWALE
-
About SUSHAMA RAJENDRA BARWALE,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01110MH1949PTC007795 DECCAN PLANTATIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 1030000.0 Active 07/05/2012 - U15142MH1979PTC199022 LEADBETER SEEDS PVT LTD 2500000.0 Active 07/05/2012 - U65990MH1990PTC055468 JAMWADI INVESTMENT AND TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 4411080.0 Active 15/02/1990 - U65990MH1990PTC055470 RAJUR GANAPATI INVESTMENT AND TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 759780.0 Active 15/02/1990 - U65990MH1990PTC055475 DUDHNA INVESTMENT AND TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 2706000.0 Active 15/02/1990 - U67120MH1990PTC055473 HARIRANI INVESTMENT AND TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 37659570.0 Active 15/02/1990 - U67120MH1990PTC055474 HARBHAJAN INVESTMENT AND TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 4600000.0 Active 15/02/1990 - U67120MH1990PTC055591 CHITTODA INVESTMENT AND TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 4300000.0 Active 28/02/1990 - U67120MH1990PTC055592 JOHN FOWLER OCULAR LENSES PRIVATE LIMITED 2390000.0 Active 28/02/1990 - U74899MH1993PTC192449 SEVEN STAR FRUITS PRIVATE LIMITED 42828350.0 Active 07/05/2012 - U85100MH1995PTC094853 JOHN FOWLER OPHTHALMICS PRIVATE LIMITED 49632000.0 Active 01/03/2013 -