SANJAY GOENKA
-
About SANJAY GOENKA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U40108DL2005PTC135505 DLF WIND POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 9900000.0 Amalgamated 27/04/2005 - U45201DL2005PTC135518 PROWESS BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 300000000.0 Amalgamated 07/07/2010 - U45202HR1984PLC018955 ALANKRIT ESTATES LIMITED 500070.0 Active 16/04/1998 - U45400DL2007PTC165427 CLEVA BUILDERS & DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Amalgamated 27/07/2010 - U55101HR2007PTC037129 SAKET HOLIDAYS RESORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/10/2012 - U74899DL1994PLC063537 VSK INVESTMENT & FINANCE LIMITED 500000.0 Amalgamated 12/09/2001 - U74920HR1999PLC034135 CEE PEE MAINTENANCE SERVICES LIMITED 700000.0 Amalgamated 06/06/2003 - U74920HR1999PLC034137 PEE TEE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT SERVICES LIMITED 2700000.0 Amalgamated 06/06/2003 - U74920HR1999PTC034169 GALLERIA PROPERTY MANAGEMENT SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 11/08/1999 - -
Associated with Directors