SATEESH SETH
-
About SATEESH SETH,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L35110GJ1997PLC033193 RELIANCE NAVAL AND ENGINEERING LIMITED 7798370270.0 Active 12/09/2016 - L40101MH1995PLC084687 RELIANCE POWER LIMITED 28051264660.0 Active 18/07/2014 - U32100MH1994PLC162841 RELIANCE TELECOM LIMITED 1434770000.0 Active 11/04/1997 - U51909MH2006GAP163022 RELIANCE ANIL DHIRUBHAI AMBANI GROUP LIMITED 0.0 Active 10/07/2006 - U72200MH2000PLC163072 RELIABLE INTERNET SERVICES LIMITED 100000000.0 Amalgamated 10/08/2005 - U72900MH1991PTC062878 TECH BARRACK SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 09/08/1991 - U74999MH2014PTC260285 RELIANCE DEFENCE AND AEROSPACE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/12/2014 - U74999MH2014PTC260286 RELIANCE DEFENCE TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/12/2014 - U74999MH2014PTC260288 RELIANCE DEFENCE SYSTEMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/12/2014 - U74999MH2015PLC263178 RELIANCE DEFENCE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 28/03/2015 - -
Associated with Directors