SHIV SHANKAR AGARWAL
-
About SHIV SHANKAR AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L74210DL1987PLC029979 SBEC SYSTEMS (INDIA) LIMITED 100000000.0 Active 22/01/2008 - U00432JH2006PLC011972 CHANDIL POWER LIMITED 14150000.0 Active 24/08/2013 - U40105UP1996PLC037250 SBEC BIOENERGY LIMITED 230000000.0 Active 07/04/1998 - U67120DL2001PLC112424 SBEC STOCKHOLDING AND INVESTMENT LIMITED 45500000.0 Active 16/09/2001 - U74900DL2008PTC183504 MODI CASINGS AND PACKAGING PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 19/09/2008 - -
Associated with Directors