SURENDRA KUMAR RANJHAN
-
About SURENDRA KUMAR RANJHAN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L74899DL1973PLC006667 HIND INDUSTRIES LIMITED 86362400.0 Active 12/08/2011 01/01/2016 U15122DL2013PTC255549 AETOS FOODS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/07/2013 01/01/2016 U63022DL1997PTC089573 MIRHA EXPORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 36850000.0 Active 30/09/2016 - -
Associated with Directors