SUNIL KUMAR TAINWALA
-
About SUNIL KUMAR TAINWALA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01132WB1996PTC079439 FORTUNE VILLAS PVT LTD 2740000.0 Active 22/04/1996 - U01403WB2008PTC124458 NILE VALLEY AGRO PLANTATIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 3930000.0 Active 14/12/2009 - U45201WB1996PTC082135 BRIGHT VILLAS PRIVATE LIMITED 1700000.0 Active 28/11/1996 - U67120WB1995PTC071437 TAAG LIFESTYLE PRIVATE LIMITED 2002000.0 Active 20/08/2001 - U70101WB2005PTC106310 KT VILLAS PVT LTD 3250000.0 Active 24/11/2005 - U70101WB2006PTC110029 TAAG ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 3180000.0 Active 22/06/2006 - -
Associated with Directors
PAWAN KUMAR KEJRIWAL Director AMITA TAINWALA Director PIYUSH MOHAN AGARWAL Director