SUBRATA DAS
-
About SUBRATA DAS,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U22219WB2002PTC094780 VOSTOK DISTRIBUTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 13925000.0 Active 13/10/2015 - U45201WB2003PLC096821 GOLDEN NIRMAN UDYOG LIMITED 87392000.0 Active 15/03/2011 - U45400WB2008PTC122914 GOMATI CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 16500000.0 Active 08/05/2012 - U51900WB2008PLC129815 ABIRA COMMOTRADE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 30/09/2008 - U63040WB2005PTC101880 GOLDEN SAFAR PRIVATE LIMITED 14200000.0 Active 24/02/2005 - U67120WB2009PLC131881 ABIRA SECURITIES LIMITED 75377750.0 Active 13/01/2009 - U70102WB2010PLC150048 ABIRA NIRMAN UDYOG LIMITED 1604500000.0 Active 31/05/2010 - U74140WB2008PLC129807 ABIRA MANAGEMENT SERVICES LIMITED 9500600.0 Active 30/09/2008 - -
Associated with Directors