SACHIN AGARWAL
-
About SACHIN AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U22219DL2005PTC138589 SUPERTECK PRINTING PRIVATE LIMITED 2500000.0 Active 15/06/2016 - U35900DL2008PTC178216 HELIOS AVIATION PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 16/05/2008 - U45200DL2006PTC156718 SAKET BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 250000.0 Active 15/06/2016 - U45200DL2011PTC226511 SIYARAM SHELTERS PRIVATE LIMITED 1662500.0 Active 19/10/2011 - U45201DL2005PTC139841 NEWACE BUILDERS AND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 250000.0 Amalgamated 25/02/2007 - U45201DL2005PTC142855 SIYARAM INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 08/01/2015 - U50400DL2011PTC226971 AANJNEYA MOTOR PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 03/11/2011 - U51909DL2003PTC120140 SIYARAM MOTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 7899000.0 Active 01/05/2003 - U51909DL2006PTC151640 S.E. OVERSEAS PRIVATE LIMITED 2000000.0 Amalgamated 08/08/2006 - U52335DL2006PTC150399 S.E. RETAIL PRIVATE LIMITED 406000.0 Amalgamated 29/06/2006 - U55101DL2006PTC216051 BLOOM INN PRIVATE LIMITED 21210000.0 Active 20/07/2016 - U55101DL2009PTC186658 SPRING RESORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 30/12/2014 - U55209DL2012PTC246139 KANAK BHAWAN PRASAD SEVA PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 11/01/2015 - U62100DL1996PTC078274 AEROTECH AVIATION INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 52878000.0 Active 25/09/2010 - U62100DL2005PTC132236 AANJNEYA VAYUSUTRA PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 15/06/2016 - U64200DL2009PTC196204 SPRING COMMUNICATIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/11/2009 - U70102DL2007PTC160265 MOR MUKUT INFRADEV PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 22/04/2011 - U70102DL2011PTC228585 REPARTEE INFRASTRUCTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/12/2017 - U70109DL2006PLC149722 SPRING INFRADEV LIMITED 3427473000.0 Active 14/06/2006 - U70200DL2007PTC168737 BLESSINGS BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 205000.0 Active 12/04/2010 - U74140DL2012PTC231029 SPRING TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 08/01/2015 - U80102RJ2016NPL055712 RAJ SHIKSHA FOUNDATION 100000.0 Active 10/08/2016 - -
Associated with Directors