SANJAY GARG
-
About SANJAY GARG,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U17115UR1998PTC023762 UTTAM FIBRES PRIVATE LIMITED 3500000.0 Active 23/03/2013 - U45200DL2010PTC207799 SHIKHA BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/09/2010 - U45200DL2011PTC229239 MEKAUSH BUILDTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/06/2012 - U45201DL2004PTC124561 SHREE GARG PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 13350000.0 Active 10/02/2004 - U45201DL2006PTC145628 NITIN ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 900000.0 Active 28/11/2014 - U45201DL2006PTC146905 GOLD RAIN DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 02/01/2007 - U45300DL2008PTC176614 ABHIRAJ BUILDERS & PROMOTERS PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 15/09/2015 - U70101DL2005PTC138848 SMS REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/01/2007 - U70101DL2010PTC207047 DIVINE CONBUILD PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/08/2010 - U70102UP2011PTC043987 SAUMYA INFRA-DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 150000.0 Active 01/04/2012 - U70200DL2013PTC256892 FOREVER INFRATECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 09/05/2014 - U74899DL1987PTC027895 SARNIMAL AGRO INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 17/03/2017 - U74899DL1995PTC067711 HERITAGE BUILDWELL PRIVATE LIMITED 2502530.0 Active 01/12/2006 - -
Associated with Directors