SANJAY CHANDRAKANT KIRLOSKAR
-
About SANJAY CHANDRAKANT KIRLOSKAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L29113PN1920PLC000670 KIRLOSKAR BROTHERS LIMITED 158817852.0 Active 19/11/2015 - L29130MH1976PLC019147 KULKARNI POWER TOOLS LTD 17000000.0 Active 30/07/2009 - U29120MH1988PLC045865 KIRLOSKAR EBARA PUMPS LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 24/08/2004 - U65993MH1972PTC016178 ASARA SALES AND INVESTMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 446600.0 Active 12/03/2010 - U65993MH1992PTC064861 PRAKAR INVESTMENTS PVT LTD 2736000.0 Active 15/01/1992 - -
Associated with Directors