SARDUL SINGH JAIN
-
About SARDUL SINGH JAIN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L17232WB1947PLC016105 RTS POWER CORPORATION LTD 156685000.0 Active 20/02/1985 - L51109WB1983PLC035969 EITA INDIA LIMITED 25928990.0 Active 13/02/2007 - L51909WB1895PLC001021 ALLIANCE UDYOG LTD. 6000000.0 Active 20/09/1980 - L67120WB1979PLC032376 OMNI HOLDINGS LTD 2400000.0 Active 26/06/1987 - L67120WB1983PLC036113 RGF CAPITAL MARKETS LTD 150024000.0 Active 01/09/1994 - L74999WB1919PLC003516 ALFRED HERBERT (INDIA) LTD 7714290.0 Active 30/10/2004 - U28939WB1942PTC025403 GWALIOR WEBBING CO. PVT. LTD. 3000000.0 Active 07/03/2015 - U29110WB1947PTC015145 JALAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PVT LTD 4525475.0 Active 10/02/2003 - U32109WB1987PLC043261 ALFRED HERBERT LIMITED 9000070.0 Active 08/11/2004 - U51109WB1942PTC075039 BARODA AGENTS AND TRADING CO. PRIVATE LIMITED 844800.0 Active 28/04/2008 - U65921WB1990PTC049910 PARAKH PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 46465000.0 Active 20/09/1990 - U65992WB1973PTC029040 ANNAPURNA SAVINGS & FINANCE CO PRIVATE LTD 5483750.0 Active 09/04/2007 - U67120WB1971PTC028146 HARI HOLDINGS PVT LTD 1300000.0 Active 18/12/2000 - U67120WB1992PTC055137 SUNGRACE FINVEST PVT LTD 9997250.0 Active 10/01/1994 - U67120WB1995PLC067806 LODHA CAPITAL MARKETS LTD 40000000.0 Active 22/08/2005 - -
Associated with Directors