SUSHILKUMAR BENIPRASAD GOENKA
-
About SUSHILKUMAR BENIPRASAD GOENKA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U18101MH1985PTC038162 STAR APPARELS PVT LTD 400000.0 Active 08/01/2001 - U27209MH2000PTC180161 RAMAKRISHNA IMPEX PRIVATE LIMITED 750000.0 Active 04/04/2001 - U29190MH1990PLC055269 ARTEK SURFIN CHEMICALS LIMITED 24922000.0 Active 16/08/1990 - U51900MH1983PTC031029 SARANG EXPORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 19500000.0 Active 04/06/1996 - -
Associated with Directors