SURESH RAJPAL
-
About SURESH RAJPAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51100MH2000PTC124404 COMFORT POINT ADMINISTRATIVE SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 101000.0 Active 01/09/2012 - U51900MH1986PTC039701 VISHAL SOYAMUL PVT LTD 100000.0 Active 01/04/1992 - U51900MH1994PTC080517 ADDAX TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 225200.0 Active 05/01/2017 - U51900MH1996PTC102477 INU EXPORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/01/2017 - U51900MH1996PTC102910 TARULATA TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 11/11/2002 - U51900MH1999PTC122959 LEHAR MANAGEMENT SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 101000.0 Active 01/09/2012 - U51904MH2000PTC124390 CLASSFINE SECURITY AGENCY PRIVATE LIMITED 101000.0 Active 01/10/2012 - U51909MH2002PTC137046 DYNACOM TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 02/11/2002 - -
Associated with Directors
ASHOK RAJPAL Director SHANTI LAL JAIN Director ISHWAR AGRAWAL Director