SRINIVAS MOVALLA
-
About SRINIVAS MOVALLA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U40101TG2003PTC042043 CORPORATE HYDRO ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/05/2012 - U40105TG2004PTC043741 MVK ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 107484800.0 Active 23/07/2004 - U40108TG2002PTC038325 NAGARJUNA HYDRO ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 318200000.0 Active 08/01/2002 - U40108TG2002PTC038326 PASCHIM HYDRO ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 140000000.0 Active 08/01/2002 - U40109TG2006PTC051819 KVM ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 239774800.0 Active 27/11/2006 - U45209TG2008PTC059113 MVK INFRASTRUCTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 67900000.0 Active 12/05/2008 - U72200TG2000PLC033353 KOVIDA LIMITED 1621200.0 Active 25/02/2004 - U80100MH1998PTC187051 SAVERI CHEMICALS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 28/08/1998 -