SHYAM SUNDER KABRA
-
About SHYAM SUNDER KABRA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27101RJ2000PTC016332 YADAV HARVANI AND COMPANY (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/11/2005 - U45201RJ2005PTC021131 AMBIENCE LANDDEVELOPERS (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 18800000.0 Active 29/09/2007 - U55101RJ2008PTC025625 COMFORT PLAZA RESORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 04/01/2008 - U70101RJ1996PTC012472 GREEN SAFARI ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/08/1996 - U92120RJ1962PTC001147 SAH THEATRES PVT LTD 1113000.0 Active 05/07/2003 - -
Associated with Directors