SHAM LAL MOHAN
-
About SHAM LAL MOHAN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L34300HR1981PLC012151 ARCOTECH LIMITED 210000000.0 Active 20/09/2014 - L45203UP2007PLC033119 JAYPEE INFRATECH LIMITED 13889334970.0 Active 23/11/2016 - U24233UP2010PLC040882 JAYPEE FERTILIZERS & INDUSTRIES LIMITED 5008500000.0 Active 28/03/2015 - U45400HR2007PLC036891 HIMALYAN EXPRESSWAY LIMITED 1430900000.0 Active 28/03/2015 - U66000DL2007PLC161503 RELIGARE HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED 5403624610.0 Active 29/10/2012 - U85191UP2012PLC053358 JAYPEE HEALTHCARE LIMITED 4275000000.0 Active 28/03/2015 - -
Associated with Directors