SANJEEV LALJI CHATURVEDI
-
About SANJEEV LALJI CHATURVEDI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01400MH2009PTC197904 MAYOS GO GREEN PRIVATE LIMITED 6100000.0 Active 31/08/2011 - U01403MH2011PTC222352 A TO Z PLANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 4100000.0 Active 23/09/2011 - U51900MH1993PTC073121 HARINIM TRADE & TRAVELS PRIVATE LIMITED 1625000.0 Active 10/08/1993 - U65923MH2014PTC253948 AGELESS CAPITAL AND FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED 103500000.0 Active 07/03/2014 - U67120MH1993PTC260638 A TO Z BROKING SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 45000000.0 Converted to LLP 25/09/1997 - -
Associated with Directors