SURINDER PAL KANWAR
-
About SURINDER PAL KANWAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L29130HR1971PLC034365 BHARAT GEARS LIMITED 81428330.0 Active 29/09/1982 - L51909HR1965PLC034315 RAUNAQ EPC INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 33432430.0 Active 21/06/1989 - U20211DL1997PTC086746 CLIPLOK SIMPAK (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 350300.0 Active 17/04/1997 - U35990HR1995PLC050123 XLERATE DRIVELINE INDIA LIMITED 161270000.0 Active 25/10/1995 - U65920DL1981PTC012523 VIBRANT FINANCE AND INVESTMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 644050.0 Active 01/07/1999 - U74140DL1988PTC034430 FUTURE CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 27824730.0 Active 28/12/2006 - U74140DL2004PTC124065 SAMREET INVESTMENT AND MANAGEMENT CONSULTANCY PRIVATE LIMITED 165000.0 Dormant under section 455 24/04/2007 - U74899DL1990PTC041386 ULTRA CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 9582200.0 Active 16/10/1998 - -
Associated with Directors