SURESH KEWALRAM KHEMANI
-
About SURESH KEWALRAM KHEMANI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15511DD1986PTC000674 ROYAL DISTILLERY PRIVATE LIMITED 1640000.0 Active 09/04/1986 - U15511DD1993PTC001431 KHEMANI DISTILLERIES PRIVATE LIMITED 11500000.0 Active 09/09/1993 - U51900MH1987PTC043398 SNOWWHITE TRADING CO PVT LTD 100000.0 Active 18/04/1992 - U65923DD1996PTC002181 KHEMANI FIN-STOCK PRIVATE LIMITED. 12001500.0 Active 03/09/1996 - U93090DD2017NPL009796 KAMLA KEWALRAM KHEMANI FOUNDATION 100000.0 Active 06/03/2017 - -
Associated with Directors
RAVINDRA MATHUR KISHOR Director ASHOK KEWALRAM KHEMANI Director VIVEK SURESH KHEMANI Director