SUDHIR KUMAR GARG
-
About SUDHIR KUMAR GARG,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01119MH2012PTC237516 LAMBODAR AGRITECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 03/11/2012 - U01400MH2012PTC237513 MORESHWAR AGRITECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 03/11/2012 - U01403MH2012PTC237272 VIGHNESHWAR AGRO FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/03/2017 - U01403MH2012PTC237321 EKAAKSHARA AGRITECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/04/2015 - U01403MH2012PTC237512 EKDANT AGRITECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 03/11/2012 - U01403MH2012PTC237647 VIGHNAHARA AGRI INFRATECH PRIVATE LIMITED 15100000.0 Active 07/11/2012 - U01404MH2012PTC237347 MANOMAY AGRITECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/03/2017 - U01404MH2012PTC237348 MUKTIDAVA AGRO PRODUCTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/03/2017 - U02710MP2006PTC018576 KALYAN IRON AND STEEL PRIVATE LIMITED 3267100.0 Active 21/04/2006 - U27106MP1995PTC010177 KALYAN ISPAT (INDIA) PVT LTD 2184000.0 Active 17/11/1995 - U45200MP2010PTC022913 KALYAN LOK NIRMAN PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U45200MP2010PTC023460 SSG NAV-NIRMAN PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/04/2010 - U45203MP1996PLC010858 KALYAN NAV NIRMAN LIMITED 12172300.0 Active 24/06/1998 - U45209MP2008PTC020582 KALYAN INDIA INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 3826600.0 Active 15/04/2008 - U65993MP2013PTC030686 KALYAN STOCK HOLDINGS (INDORE) PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/03/2017 -