SURENDRA RAMAKRISHNA NAYAK
-
About SURENDRA RAMAKRISHNA NAYAK,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51100MH2005PLC153110 JM FINANCIAL COMMTRADE LIMITED 235000000.0 Active 06/05/2005 - U51900MH2008PTC177478 LATITUDE MERCANTILE PRIVATE LIMITED 56600000.0 Amalgamated 07/01/2008 - U62392MH1995PTC085267 FINANCIAL ENGINEERING SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 80000000.0 Active 06/02/1995 - U65192MH1995PLC092522 JM FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONAL SECURITIES LIMITED 280000000.0 Active 10/08/2012 - U65990MH1984PTC033480 PERSEPOLIS INVESTMENT COMPANY PVT LTD 1460000.0 Active 16/06/2014 - U65990MH2010PLC201513 JM FINANCIAL PROPERTIES AND HOLDINGS LIMITED 980500000.0 Active 14/05/2013 - U67120MH1975PTC018543 SNK INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 1500000.0 Active 16/06/2014 - U67120MH1989PLC052697 JSB SECURITIES LIMITED 60000000.0 Active 27/04/1998 - U67190MH1989PLC051252 JM FINANCIAL VENTURES LIMITED 90000000.0 Amalgamated 28/06/2003 - U70100MH1990PLC058650 KAMPANI PROPERTIES AND HOLDINGS LIMITED 1100000.0 Active 28/06/2003 - U70101MH2006PTC165908 ORACLE ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 10100000.0 Amalgamated 01/09/2008 - -
Associated with Directors