SUNIL KANTI ROY
-
About SUNIL KANTI ROY,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45400WB2006PTC107741 S K R RESIDENCY PVT LTD 7478000.0 Amalgamated 02/05/2008 - U55101WB1987PLC042703 KAIZEN HOTELS & RESORTS LIMITED 18461700.0 Active 26/02/2007 - U55101WB1990PLC049988 PEERLESS HOTELS LTD. 45800000.0 Active 09/10/1990 - U65993WB1988PLC044077 PEERLESS FINANCIAL SERVICES LTD 372579080.0 Active 05/04/1988 - U65993WB1988PTC044114 BICHITRA HOLDINGS PVT LTD 24702400.0 Active 17/05/2006 - U65993WB1988PTC044115 SHIKHA HOLDINGS PVT LTD 23530500.0 Active 30/10/2000 - U66010WB1932PLC007490 THE PEERLESS GENERAL FINANCE & INVESTMENT CO LTD 331558400.0 Active 02/12/1983 - U67120WB1995PLC067616 PEERLESS SECURITIES LTD 246862140.0 Active 19/01/1995 - U70101WB1994PLC063280 BENGAL PEERLESS HOUSING DEVELOPMENT COMPANY LTD 18063000.0 Active 20/05/1994 - U70109WB1987PLC042819 PEERLESS FINANCIAL PRODUCTS DISTRIBUTION LIMITED 515685360.0 Active 22/03/2006 - U85110WB1989PLC046938 PEERLESS HOSPITEX HOSPITAL AND RESEARCH CENTER LTD. 415703130.0 Active 25/05/1989 - -
Associated with Directors