SARVESH KUMAR SHARMA
-
About SARVESH KUMAR SHARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L65993WB1990PLC048314 WELTER SECURITIES LIMITED 100000000.0 Active 09/01/2007 - U13203HR1997PTC038805 DEO STEEL AND MINES PRIVATE LIMITED 55210000.0 Active 24/03/2012 - U74899DL1984PTC058843 NAVUDAY MERCANTILE PVT LTD 4758000.0 Amalgamated 01/09/2005 - U74899DL1986PTC023590 PLR CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LTD 5180000.0 Amalgamated 01/09/2006 - U80211DL1991NPL045004 PRAKASH EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTION 0.0 Active 15/09/2006 -