SANGEETA SAXENA
-
About SANGEETA SAXENA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45200DL2006PTC146048 PEE EES BUILDTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/02/2006 - U45201DL2005PTC139646 VENUS INFRACON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/08/2005 - U45202DL2006PTC146039 PEE EES INFRACON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/02/2006 - U45203DL2007PTC159804 CORPORATE INFRACON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/08/2009 - U65921DL1996PTC084090 VENUS REALTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 1100000.0 Active 11/11/2002 - U70102DL2009PTC188790 KSHITIJ REALTECH CONSULTING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/03/2009 - U70109DL2006PTC151178 B.S. BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/08/2009 - U70109DL2006PTC151325 VENUS LANDBASE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/08/2009 - U74899DL1994PTC059871 SHITIZ CONSTRUCTION & REALTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 25/08/2005 - U92412DL2009PTC195413 VENUS FILMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 22/10/2009 - -
Associated with Directors
PANKAJ SAXENA Director KAPIL MEHRA Director RAJESH KUMAR BHALLA Director