SANDEEP KEJARIWAL
-
About SANDEEP KEJARIWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01400MH2009PTC197907 MAXIS PLANT PRIVATE LIMITED 348750.0 Active 31/08/2011 - U01400MH2011PTC222014 SANDEEP FARMING PRIVATE LIMITED 335000.0 Active 14/09/2011 - U01400MH2011PTC222250 RIVERBED AGRO PRIVATE LIMITED 2250000.0 Active 21/09/2011 - U01403MH2011PTC222258 YASHVI FARMS AND PLANTATION PRIVATE LIMITED 1800000.0 Active 02/07/2012 - U01403MH2011PTC222369 SHRIYAM AGRICULTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 3210040.0 Active 14/07/2012 - U31401MH1984PTC166640 G T Z BOMBAY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/05/1995 - U45400MH2006PTC164679 GEECEE BUSINESS PRIVATE LIMITED 420000.0 Active 01/08/2009 - U51900MH1996PTC096827 MAHOTSAV TRADING AND FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED 912000.0 Amalgamated 01/02/1996 - U51900MH1996PTC096828 WINDSOR TRADING AND FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED 602000.0 Amalgamated 01/02/1996 - U65999GJ2016PTC094522 FOUR DIMENSIONS SECURITIES (IFSC) PRIVATE LIMITED 15000000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 30/11/2016 - U70102MH2007PTC171723 BETTER TIME REALTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 2400000.0 Active 15/02/2013 - U74999MH1985PLC034989 FOUR DIMENSIONS SECURITIES (INDIA) LIMITED 118111650.0 Active 07/02/1997 - -
Associated with Directors